Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Maria Guida

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1811³Born
20 Sep 183423.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 185240.6SelectedBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
27 Sep 185241.2ConfirmedBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
29 Sep 185241.2Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
6 Dec 186251.4DiedBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccola Maria Guida
Bishop Niccola Maria Guida (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVietri di Potenza
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 379
  • c34: CB, 25 Mar 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast