Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Luigi Pera

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1796BornSan Gennaro
18 Mar 182023.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 184548.6AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
1 May 184548.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
8 Jul 184649.8DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Luigi Pera (VIAF: 72582459)
Archbishop Pietro Luigi Pera (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1845, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016