Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Cansacchi (Consacchi)

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1592Born
15 Dec 163644.0AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
1 Jan 163744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
12 Oct 164451.8DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Cansacchi (Consacchi)
Bishop Filippo Cansacchi (Consacchi) (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmelia

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 197
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 98, Number 588
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 1
  • bd/bp/d: CB, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017