Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre della Stufa (Lotteringhi)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹Born
2 Oct 162332.7AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
22 Oct 162332.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
1640²49.0ResignedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
3 Oct 164655.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Montepulciano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Alexandre della Stufa (Lotteringhi)
Bishop Alexandre della Stufa (Lotteringhi)
(born 1591, died )
Bishop Emeritus of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 248
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 80, Number 475
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025