Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arcangelo Baldini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹Born
20 Jul 162650.5AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
27 Sep 162650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
27 Nov 162953.9DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Baldini
Bishop Arcangelo Baldini O.P. (born 1576, died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Croce, Church, Gravina, Diocese of Gravina (di Puglia)

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 197
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 38
  • ob/c2/d/loc: AT, 8 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Mar 2019

Quantcast