Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550²Born
2 Aug 159343.5AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
29 Aug 159343.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
3 Oct 161464.7DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Giustiniani
Bishop Vincenzo Giustiniani (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 197
  • b/c2+: CB, 6 Feb 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,593, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast