Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Xaverio Giannuzzi Savelli

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1810BornCosenza
19 Feb 183222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Jul 183222.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 185040.8SelectedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
17 Feb 185141.0ConfirmedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
24 Feb 185141.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
14 Aug 185141.5DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Xaverio Giannuzzi Savelli (VIAF: 89001341)
Bishop Francesco Xaverio Giannuzzi Savelli (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Dec 2016