Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Sanna, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1873BornOristano
4 May 189016.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 May 189622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Dec 191441.1AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
2 Feb 191541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
12 May 192248.5AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
15 Apr 195379.4RetiredBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
15 Apr 195379.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
7 Oct 195682.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Sanna:
Bishop Giovanni Maria Sanna O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013