Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cleto Cassani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sassari

Titular Archbishop of Achrida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1866BornVailate
1890¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 191144.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sassari, Italy
1 Feb 191144.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
17 Apr 191144.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
5 Jan 191750.3AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1 Jul 192962.8ResignedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1 Jul 192962.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
11 Mar 193972.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cleto Cassani:
Archbishop Cleto Cassani (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sassari

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013