Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Gamberoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1868Born
19 Mar 189122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 Apr 191142.5AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
25 May 191142.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chiavari, Italy
22 Mar 191748.4AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
17 Feb 192960.3DiedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gamberoni
Archbishop Giovanni Gamberoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComerio
Ordained BishopCarate Brianza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 41
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast