Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ferretti

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1862Born
17 Nov 191755.3AppointedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
24 Feb 191855.5Ordained BishopBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
24 Mar 192461.6AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
15 Aug 192462.0InstalledBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
26 Nov 193472.3DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ferretti
Bishop Luigi Ferretti (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugo

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast