Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Del Ponte

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1865Born
5 Sep 192358.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Acqui, Italy
5 Sep 192358.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
30 Nov 192358.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
14 May 192660.9AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
18 Dec 194277.5DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Del Ponte
Bishop Lorenzo Del Ponte (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo Belbo

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast