Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Oberti, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1862Born
25 Feb 188825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
16 Dec 190139.0AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
22 Dec 190139.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
1 Mar 190239.2InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
23 Nov 194280.0DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Oberti
Bishop Giovanni Oberti Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOvada

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 5,905
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 495
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast