Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Beccaro

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1889BornGrognardo
14 Aug 191425.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 193950.1AppointedBishop of Nuoro, Italy
7 May 193950.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nuoro, Italy
26 Nov 194657.8AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
9 Feb 197283.0DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Beccaro:
Bishop Felice Beccaro (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015