Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Valvassori, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1627BornTrezzo
18 Mar 168658.6AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
25 Mar 168658.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
2 Oct 168962.2DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Valvassori:
Bishop Domenico Valvassori O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 213
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014