Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Maria Benzoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chioggia

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1670BornVenezia
30 Jun 171545.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 173363.0AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
15 Mar 173363.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
12 Jun 174474.3ResignedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
11 Sep 175484.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
8 Jan 175786.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Benzoni:
Archbishop Giovanni Maria Benzoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chioggia

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 169, and Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013