Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Dominico Bragadin, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1691BornVenezia
10 Jun 171423.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Aug 171524.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Aug 171524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Sep 173342.5AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
6 Dec 173342.7Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
18 Aug 175362.4SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
26 Sep 175362.5ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
21 Jun 176271.2DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Dominico Bragadin:
Bishop Vincenzo Dominico Bragadin O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170, and Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015