Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Marco Gradenigo

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1663Born
22 Aug 169936.3AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
22 Aug 169936.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Titopolis
6 Feb 170137.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titopolis
19 Nov 171451.6AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
11 Jun 172562.1AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
14 Nov 173471.6DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Gradenigo:
Patriarch Marco Gradenigo (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 94, and Page 382
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 409, and Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015