Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Nani

Deceased

Archbishop of Corfù


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1696BornVenezia
21 Sep 172529.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172730.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
16 Mar 1727³30.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
18 Apr 174245.6AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
Apr 1765³68.6DiedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Nani:
Archbishop Antonio Nani (born , died Apr 1765) Archbishop of Corfù

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 324
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015