Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Daniello Marco Cardinal Delfino

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1653BornVenice
2 Jan 169642.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
7 Jan 169642.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
29 Jan 169642.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
15 Sep 169844.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Brescia, Italy
14 Nov 169946.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 170046.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
5 Aug 170450.8DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniello Marco Delfino:
Daniello Marco Cardinal Delfino (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1699
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015