Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Andrea Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1661BornChioggia
30 Mar 170038.8AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
9 May 170038.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
Jan 1712³50.6DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Andrea Grassi:
Bishop Francesco Andrea Grassi (born , died Jan 1712) Bishop of Caorle

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015