Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1655Born
20 Jan 169236.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 169236.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 169237.1AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
30 Mar 169237.1Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
2 Mar 173580.0DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Giustiniani
Bishop Marco Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMurano, Diocese of Torcello (Turris)
Buried Place (Original)Santi Maria e Donato, Basilica, Murano, Diocese of Torcello (Turris)

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 383
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,692, Number 51
  • b/ob/c2: AT, 1 Jan 2018
  • b/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,565

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast