Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Fabi

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1744³BornSan Gemini
17 Dec 176824.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178540.8AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
2 Oct 178540.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
31 Mar 179853.3DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Fabi:
Bishop Carlo Fabi (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1794
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016