Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Gardini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1738BornVenezia
25 Jul 176022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Mar 176122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Sep 178244.5AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
29 Sep 178244.5Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
Sep 1800³62.4DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Gardini:
Bishop Antonio Maria Gardini O.S.B. (born , died Sep 1800) Bishop of Crema

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 186
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015