Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marie-Jacques Guilhem

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laval, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1897Born
28 Jun 192426.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 195961.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Laval, France
8 Apr 195961.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
22 Jun 195961.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
28 Feb 196264.2SucceededBishop of Laval, France
31 Dec 196972.0ResignedBishop of Laval, France
31 Dec 196972.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
10 Dec 197073.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
19 Jun 197577.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie-Jacques Guilhem
Bishop Charles-Marie-Jacques Guilhem (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018