Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Louis Carrière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laval


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1908BornChâlons
8 Jul 193123.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 196860.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Laval, France
5 Nov 196860.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Labicum
11 Jan 196960.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Labicum
31 Dec 196961.8SucceededBishop of Laval, France
10 Mar 198475.9RetiredBishop of Laval, France
21 Feb 200899.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Louis Carrière:
Bishop Paul-Louis Carrière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laval

  • a priest for 76.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013