Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Paul Droulers

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1887BornTourcoing
29 Jun 191022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
17 Feb 194759.2AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
6 May 194759.4Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
3 Jun 195062.5DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Albert-Paul Droulers:
Bishop Albert-Paul Droulers (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013