Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Émile Jean-Louis Coliche

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lille, France

Titular Bishop of Alet


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1940 Born
20 Dec 196929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
9 Jul 200968.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
9 Jul 200968.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Alet
27 Sep 200968.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alet
22 Feb 201776.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Gérard Émile Jean-Louis Coliche
Bishop Gérard Émile Jean-Louis Coliche (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBéziers

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lille.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,283
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Feb 2017