Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Durand de Chapelles

Deceased

Bishop of Maguelonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Dec 1345AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
17 Sep 1348AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
15 May 1353AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
Jan 1361³DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Durand de Chapelles
Bishop Durand de Chapelles (died Jan 1361) Bishop of Maguelonne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 320, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 May 2019

Quantcast