Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Blauzac (Blandiac)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1348AppointedBishop of Nīmes, France
17 Sep 1361AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
17 Sep 1361Elevated to Cardinal
Sep 1372³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
6 Jul 1379DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Blauzac (Blandiac):
Cardinal Jean de Blauzac (Blandiac) (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013