Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal Aleman, C.R.S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Arles

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1390¹BornArbent
22 Jun 141828.5AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
20 Nov 141828.9Ordained BishopBishop of Maguelonne, France
3 Dec 142333.9AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
16 May 142434.4InstalledArchbishop of Arles, France
24 May 142636.4Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 142636.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
11 Apr 144050.3ResignedArchbishop of Arles, France
16 Oct 145060.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Arles, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Aleman:
Cardinal Louis Aleman C.R.S.J. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arles

  • a bishop for 31.9 years
  • a cardinal for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,123
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 4 Dec 2013