Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Martin V

Oddone Colonna

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1368BornGenazzano
12 Jun 140537.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 140537.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
11 Nov 141749.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Nov 141749.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Nov 141749.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Nov 141749.8Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
21 Nov 141749.8InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Feb 143163.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Oddone Colonna:
Pope Oddone Colonna (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 13.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014