Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Barrow

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1418AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
22 Feb 1418Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
19 Apr 1423AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
4 Sep 1429DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Barrow:
Bishop William Barrow (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,824
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 127, and Page 289
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 101
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 238
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013