Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Marie Fournier de la Contamine

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1750BornGex
16 Jul 180655.5SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
26 Aug 180655.6ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
8 Dec 180655.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
29 Dec 183484.0DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Marie Fournier de la Contamine:
Bishop Nicolas-Marie Fournier de la Contamine (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015