Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Lovier

Deceased

Bishop of Maguelonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1386AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
19 Oct 1389AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
23 Oct 1405DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Lovier
Bishop Antoine de Lovier (died ) Bishop of Maguelonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 417, and Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast