Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André de Frédol, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Maguelonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Mar 1314AppointedBishop of Uzés, France
7 Oct 1316Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
8 Feb 1318AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
29 Feb 1328DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

MicroData Summary for André de Frédol
Bishop André de Frédol O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Maguelonne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 510, and Page 320
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 19 Dec 2020

Quantcast