Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Jean Louis Guellec

Auxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

Titular Bishop of Senez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1961 Born
17 Jun 198928.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
17 Jun 199029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
17 Apr 201958.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
17 Apr 201958.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Senez
7 Jul 201958.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Senez

MicroData Summary for Alain Jean Louis Guellec
Bishop Alain Jean Louis Guellec (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePont-l’Abbé, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconChurch, Douarnenez, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Church, Brest, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montpellier, Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 17 Apr 2019
  • od/c01: AJ, 30 Apr 2019
  • bp: AJ, 14 May 2019
  • c2: CB, 28 Jun 2019
  • mn: AJ, 1 Jul 2019
  • c34: AJ, 7 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Jul 2019

Quantcast