Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaucelin de Deux

Deceased

Bishop

Bishop of Maguelonne


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1362AppointedBishop of Nīmes, France
1363Ordained BishopBishop of Nīmes, France
13 Mar 1367AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
31 Mar 1373DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

MicroData Summary for Gaucelin de Deux
Bishop Gaucelin de Deux (died ) Bishop

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas, Church, Nīmes, Diocese of Nīmes, France

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 361, and Page 320
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,920
  • ab: CB, 7 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast