Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raymond Cardinal de Canilhac, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1345AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
17 Dec 1350AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
17 Dec 1350Elevated to Cardinal
4 Nov 1361AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
20 Jun 1373DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Raymond de Canilhac
Raymond Cardinal de Canilhac C.R.S.A. (died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoche Canilhac, at the Gévaudan, Diocese of Mende, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Franciscans, Church, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 22.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast