Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Gascq

Deceased

Bishop of Nīmes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Mar 1367Ordained BishopBishop of Nīmes, France
20 Mar 1367AppointedBishop of Nīmes, France
27 Aug 1369DiedBishop of Nīmes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Gascq
Bishop Jean Gascq (died ) Bishop of Nīmes

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Germain, Montpellier, Diocese of Maguelonne

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 361
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast