Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anglic Cardinal de Grimoard, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1315¹Born
12 Dec 136247.9AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
8 Jan 136348.0Ordained BishopBishop of Avignon, France
1366¹51.0ResignedBishop of Avignon, France
18 Sep 136651.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 136651.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
17 Sep 136752.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
13 Apr 1388³73.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anglic de Grimoard
Anglic Cardinal de Grimoard O.S.A. (born 1315, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrizac
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1366
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 May 2019

Quantcast