Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Álvarez de Albornoz

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1336BornCuenca
4 Jun 136933.4AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
22 Sep 136933.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 136933.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
9 Jun 137135.4AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
2 Jul 137438.5DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Álvarez de Albornoz:
Archbishop Fernando Álvarez de Albornoz (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 4.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 507, and Page 278
  • ob/c12: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,005
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 305, Number 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014