Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guy Marie Alexandre Thomazeau

Archbishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1937 BornNeuilly-sur-Seine
18 Dec 196528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
12 Nov 198850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Meaux, France
12 Nov 198850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
8 Jan 198951.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chunavia
14 Sep 199456.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
13 May 199557.4SucceededBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
28 Aug 200264.7AppointedBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
8 Dec 200265.0AppointedArchbishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
3 Jun 201173.5ResignedArchbishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
8 Aug 201375.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nice, France
11 May 201476.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Guy Marie Alexandre Thomazeau:
Archbishop Guy Marie Alexandre Thomazeau (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,034
  • ab: CB, 8 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014