Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Evangelista Parzaghi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
19 Aug 166949.6AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
1 Sep 166949.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
24 Aug 168868.6DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Evangelista Parzaghi
Archbishop Giovanni Evangelista Parzaghi O.F.M. (born 1620, died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrema, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast