Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Spennazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornSienne
5 Oct 163740.7AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
11 Oct 163740.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pienza, Italy
11 Aug 1658³61.6DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Spennazzi:
Bishop Giovanni Spennazzi (died ) Bishop of Pienza

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Mar 2015