Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
20 Nov 162335.8AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
26 Nov 162335.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
1637²49.0ResignedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
11 Jul 163951.5AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
7 Dec 166476.9DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Carafa:
Bishop Tommaso Carafa (died ) Bishop of Capaccio

  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 134, and Page 374
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 81, Number 480
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015