Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Sciamanna

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornTerni
17 Aug 163737.6AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
4 Oct 163737.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
10 Mar 164242.1AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
1647¹47.0DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bruno Sciamanna:
Bishop Bruno Sciamanna , Bishop of Caserta

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138, and Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Mar 2015