Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simone Carafa Roccella, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1638AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
12 Sep 1638Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
14 May 1647SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
16 Sep 1647ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
22 Mar 1676DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Carafa Roccella
Archbishop Simone Carafa Roccella C.R. (died ) Archbishop of Messina

  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67, and Page 239
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 102, Number 615
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018