Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco d’Elia e Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
2 May 163961.3AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
8 May 163961.3Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 Dec 164769.9DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco d’Elia e Rossi
Bishop Francesco d’Elia e Rossi (born 1578, died ) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 325
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 625
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast