Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Filonardi

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 May 1615AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
31 May 1615Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Italy
21 Jan 1645DiedBishop of Aquino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Filonardi
Bishop Alessandro Filonardi (died ) Bishop of Aquino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerra Balbaei

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 58, Number 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,615, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast